NH HB497 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing a school district to exempt its chief administrative officer from compulsory participation in the retirement system.
Title
Allowing a school district to exempt its chief administrative officer from compulsory participation in the retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 31 |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 17 |
2021-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98073405784 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99800820017 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 51 |