NH HB497 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 6/5/2015; Chapter 95; Effective Date 8/4/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 6/5/2015; Chapter 95; Effective Date 8/4/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to interference with a cemetery burial plot.
Title
Relative to interference with a cemetery burial plot.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/5/2015; Chapter 95; Effective Date 8/4/2015 |
2015-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1779 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/23/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Hearing: 4/14/15, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 566 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 4 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 350 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 226 |