NH HB496 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2875s
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to identify the requirements needed to commit New Hampshire to a goal of at least 50 percent renewable energy for electricity by 2040.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to identify the requirements needed to commit New Hampshire to a goal of at least 50 percent renewable energy for electricity by 2040.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2875s
2019-11-14SenateHearing: 11/20/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm, on proposed amendment # 2019-2863s; Senate Calendar 43
2019-05-23SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23
2019-03-28SenateHearing: 04/02/2019, Room 103, State House, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 16
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0497h (NT): Motion Adopted DV 196-137 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 36
2019-03-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0497h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 36
2019-03-07HouseSpecial Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection House Journal 8 P. 60
2019-02-21HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-21HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0497h (NT) for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 19
2019-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 02/19/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback