NH HB491 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to immunity for school personnel using reasonable force to protect a minor.
Title
Relative to immunity for school personnel using reasonable force to protect a minor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/7/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Hearing: 4/14/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0721h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 781 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0721h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 781 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0721h for Mar 11 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 398 |
2015-03-04 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2015 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 ==RECESSED== |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 226 |