NH HB487 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 566
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 566
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that planning board and zoning board of adjustment members be elected.
Title
Requiring that planning board and zoning board of adjustment members be elected.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Comeau [R] | Rep. Lino Avellani [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 566 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 4 (Vote 16-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 225 |