NH HB485 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating a one-day license for alcoholic beverages served at dinners hosted at farms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a one-day license for alcoholic beverages served at dinners hosted at farms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 4
2019-02-26HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 3
2019-02-07House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-02-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 16

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback