NH HB485 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB485

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Pending Motion Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to standards for emerging contaminants in drinking water, and relative to standards for perfluorochemicals in drinking water, ambient groundwater, and surface water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to standards for emerging contaminants in drinking water, and relative to standards for perfluorochemicals in drinking water, ambient groundwater, and surface water.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenatePending Motion Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1598s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1598s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-17SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1598s, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18
2018-03-26SenateHearing: 04/03/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:25 am; Senate Calendar 15
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced 02/01/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4
2018-01-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2512h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 65
2018-01-03HouseAmendment # 2017-2512h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 65
2017-11-16HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2512h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-3; Regular Calendar)
2017-10-19HouseExecutive Session: 11/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-10-04HouseRetained Bill Division I Work Session: 10/17/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2017-09-28House==CONTINUED== Retained Bill Division I Work Session: 10/03/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2017-09-20House==RECESSED== Retained Bill Division I Work Session: 09/28/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2017-03-16HouseRetained in Committee
2017-03-13House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/15/2017 04:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-03-09HouseDivision I Work Session: 03/10/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212
2017-03-09House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/13/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-03-09HouseReferred to Finance 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 26
2017-03-09HouseRules Suspension to refer to Finance (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 26
2017-03-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0322h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 335-29 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 24
2017-03-09HouseAmendment # 2017-0322h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 23
2017-03-09HouseSpecial Order to next order of business (Rep. Christensen): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 22
2017-03-08HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. J. Graham) 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 7
2017-02-23HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0322h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar)
2017-02-15House==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/22/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 306
2017-02-08House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-02-01House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/15/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-02-01HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/08/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2017 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 15

Same As/Similar To

HB485 (Carry Over) 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2512h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-3; Regular Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback