NH HB483 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adopting the psychology interjurisdictional compact (PSYPACT).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopting the psychology interjurisdictional compact (PSYPACT).

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)
2019-10-22HouseExecutive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-06HouseRetained in Committee
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-23HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 16

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback