NH HB483 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 238; Effective Date 7/13/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 238; Effective Date 7/13/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the commission on primary care workforce issues.
Title
Relative to the commission on primary care workforce issues.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Charles McMahon [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] |
Rep. James MacKay [D] | Rep. Tara Sad [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 238; Effective Date 7/13/2015 |
2015-07-02 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2141 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2292c: Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 54, PG. 2125 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2292c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2015-2292c; Senate Amendment, Filed |
2015-06-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 6/17/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-06-08 | House | Conferee Change: Rep Snow Replaces Rep Stephen Schmidt; House Journal 44, PG. 1950 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Sanborn, Avard, and Kelly |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Kotowski, McMahon, S. Schmidt, LeBrun; House Journal 44, PG. 1815 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1883s and Requests Committee of Conference (Rep Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1815 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1883s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2015-1883s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1715s, New Title, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1715s, New Title, 5/21/15; Senate Calendar 22 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Hearing: 4/14/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0236h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 562 |
2015-03-04 | House | Amendment #0236h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 562 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0236h for Mar 4 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 347 |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 225 |