NH HB482 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the use of ballots with embedded security, traceability, and relative to the chain of custody for ballots cast in elections.
Title
Requiring the use of ballots with embedded security, traceability, and relative to the chain of custody for ballots cast in elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-13 | House | Removed from Consent (Reps. T. Mannion, Yokela, Read, Santonastaso, T. Lekas, Kenny, Tenczar, Popovici-Muller, Burnham, Granger) 02/13/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 482-FN 02/07/2023 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 5 |
2023-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Election Law |