NH HB482 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB482
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-22 - Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-22 - Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of campaign contributions for personal use expenditures.
Title
Relative to the use of campaign contributions for personal use expenditures.
Sponsors
Rep. Anita Burroughs [D] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. Wendy Chase [D] | Rep. Charlotte DiLorenzo [D] |
Rep. Jaci Grote [D] | Rep. Mark McLean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-22 | House | Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2021 12:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/99327579520 |
2021-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/10/2021 10:10 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95087806399 (if necessary) |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/93640014012 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initiallyconvened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 49 |
Same As/Similar To
HB482 (Carry Over) 2021-09-22 - Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308