NH HB481 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-29 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2126h 10/28/2021 (Vote 21-0; )
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the office of the right-to-know ombudsman and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the office of the right-to-know ombudsman and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2126h 10/28/2021 (Vote 21-0; )
2021-10-06HouseExecutive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2021-09-15HouseDivision I Work Session: 09/28/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212
2021-08-31HouseDivision I Work Session: 09/14/2021 02:45 pm Legislative Office Building 212
2021-03-30HouseRetained in Committee
2021-03-25HouseExecutive Session: 03/29/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660
2021-03-04HouseDivision I Work Session: 03/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94444579237
2021-02-24HouseReferred to Finance 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 74
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 74
2021-02-18HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-02-18HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 16-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 22
2021-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 01/26/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94597513398 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 49

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback