NH HB481 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the legalization and regulation of cannabis and making appropriations therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the legalization and regulation of cannabis and making appropriations therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 200 N: 163 NV: 17 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - OTP (Y: 209 N: 147 NV: 12 Abs: 32) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-05-02Senate==RECONVENE== Hearing: 05/07/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 21
2019-04-18Senate==RECESSED== Hearing: 04/23/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:35 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-04-18SenateIntroduced 04/18/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 14
2019-04-04HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1310h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-163 04/04/2019
2019-04-04HouseAmendment # 2019-1310h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/04/2019
2019-03-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1310h for 04/04/2019 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 6
2019-03-26HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/27/2019 09:55 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-19HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-19House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-19HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-19HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/25/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-19HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/22/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-13HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-06House==TIME CHANGE== Public Hearing: 03/14/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Ways and Means 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 36
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 209-147 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 33
2019-02-21HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-21HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 16
2019-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-02-11House==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-02-07HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-17House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-17House==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 02/06/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Reps Hall
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback