NH HB476 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/14/2021; Chapter 111; Eff: I. 1&2 eff 9/12/21 II. Rem eff 7/14/21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/14/2021; Chapter 111; Eff: I. 1&2 eff 9/12/21 II. Rem eff 7/14/21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to election officers at additional polling place and relative to legalizing, ratifying, and confirming all actions, votes, and proceedings of the annual meeting of the town of Middleton.
Title
Relative to election officers at additional polling place and relative to legalizing, ratifying, and confirming all actions, votes, and proceedings of the annual meeting of the town of Middleton.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/14/2021; Chapter 111; Eff: I. 1&2 eff 9/12/21 II. Rem eff 7/14/21 |
2021-07-12 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1282s (Rep. B. Griffin): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 9 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1282s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1282s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1282s, 05/13/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/26/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/26/2021, 09:10 am, on proposed amendment # 2021-1127s; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 12 |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 9 |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 02/17/2021 01:30 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/95842759377 |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2021 11:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95709405955 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 49 |