NH HB475 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-12 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-12 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the production of a drivers' license or nondrivers' picture identification card as a condition of conducting certain business.
Title
Prohibiting the production of a drivers' license or nondrivers' picture identification card as a condition of conducting certain business.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-03-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 16-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 66 |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2021 01:20 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94408830780 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 10:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following linksTo join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98678901926 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 49 |