NH HB473 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB473
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a renter's insurance notification requirement.
Title
Establishing a renter's insurance notification requirement.
Sponsors
Rep. John Janigian [R] | Sen. Daryl Abbas [R] | Rep. Michael Edgar [D] | Rep. Betty Gay [R] |
Rep. Everett McBride [R] | Sen. Charles Morse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-08-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2021 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-03-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2021 01:40 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94408830780 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 02:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following linksTo join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98678901926 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 49 |
Same As/Similar To
HB473 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308