NH HB473 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 178-171 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 178-171 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing hobby distillation of liquors.
Title
Allowing hobby distillation of liquors.
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Reed Panasiti [R] |
Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 178-171 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 10 |
2019-02-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-02-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 7 |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 15 |