NH HB471 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-02 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-02 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the discontinuance of certain tolls and authorizing the department of transportation to establish a toll plaza between exits 1 and 2 on the F.E. Everett turnpike.
Title
Relative to the discontinuance of certain tolls and authorizing the department of transportation to establish a toll plaza between exits 1 and 2 on the F.E. Everett turnpike.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Barry [R] | Rep. Chris Christensen [R] | Rep. John Graham [R] | Rep. Ken Hawkins [R] |
Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Sen. Raymond White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.675 | |
2011-02-17 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 2 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.390 | |
2011-02-02 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2011 Legislative Office Building 201 1:00 PM or Immediately Following House Session | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 11, PG. 187 |