NH HB47 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to medical records attestations for organ donation eligibility.
Title
Relative to medical records attestations for organ donation eligibility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB 47 02/02/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 7 |
2023-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-18 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/25/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |