NH HB469 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 205-136 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 205-136 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to limiting amendments to warrant articles in towns that have adopted official ballot voting.
Title
Relative to limiting amendments to warrant articles in towns that have adopted official ballot voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - ITL (Y: 205 N: 136 NV: 21 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 205-136 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 25 |
2019-03-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-03-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/14/2019 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 9 |
2019-02-15 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 15 |