NH HB469 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2017; Chapter 221; I. Sec. 1 eff. 9/8/2017 ; II. Sec. 2 eff. 1/1/2018 ; III. Sec. 8-11 eff. 7/1/2020 ; IV. Rem. eff. 7/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a continuous quality improvement program for pharmacies, relative to vaccines administered by pharmacists, and relative to the authority of the insurance department on federal health care reform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a continuous quality improvement program for pharmacies, relative to vaccines administered by pharmacists, and relative to the authority of the insurance department on federal health care reform.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment 2152s (Y: 9 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment 2148s (Y: 9 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment 2149s (Y: 9 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment 2150s (Y: 9 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Committee Amendment 2004s (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/10/2017; Chapter 221; I. Sec. 1 eff. 9/8/2017 ; II. Sec. 2 eff. 1/1/2018 ; III. Sec. 8-11 eff. 7/1/2020 ; IV. Rem. eff. 7/10/2017
2017-06-22SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-22HouseEnrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 23
2017-06-08HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2004s (Rep. Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 5
2017-06-01SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-2004s, Regular Calendar 20Y-3N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-06-01SenateSen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on Ought to Pass with Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-06-01SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-2004s, Regular Calendar 19Y-4N, Motion Adopted; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-06-01SenateSen. Feltes Floor Amendment #2017-2152s, Regular Calendar 9Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-06-01SenateSen. Feltes Floor Amendment #2017-2148s, Regular Calendar 9Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-06-01SenateSen. Feltes Floor Amendment #2017-2149s, Regular Calendar 9Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-06-01SenateSen. Feltes Floor Amendment #2017-2150s, Regular Calendar 9Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-06-01SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-2004s, Regular Calendar 22Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-05-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2004s, 05/31/2017; Senate Calendar 25
2017-05-18SenateHearing: 05/23/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm, on proposed amendment #2017-1872s; Senate Calendar 24
2017-05-18SenateHearing: 05/23/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm, on proposed amendment #2017-1868s; Senate Calendar 24
2017-05-18SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Rerefer, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
2017-05-18SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Remove HB 469 from the Consent Calendar; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
2017-05-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1705s, 05/18/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23
2017-03-29SenateHearing: 04/06/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 17
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 111
2017-03-02HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-22HouseExecutive Session: 03/01/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-02-22HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/01/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2017-02-22HousePublic Hearing: 02/28/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Executive Departments and Administration 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 41
2017-02-15HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 41
2017-02-10HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/15/2017 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 20
2017-02-08HouseExecutive Session: 02/07/2017 Legislative Office Building 205
2017-01-25HousePublic Hearing: 01/31/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=661&sy=2017&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=HB469
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2017&id=714&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=180&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=HB0469&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=HB469&ddlsponsors=&lsr=661
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=181&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=HB0469&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=HB469&ddlsponsors=&lsr=661
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=182&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=HB0469&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=HB469&ddlsponsors=&lsr=661
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=183&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=HB0469&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=HB469&ddlsponsors=&lsr=661
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=184&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=HB0469&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=HB469&ddlsponsors=&lsr=661
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=185&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=HB0469&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=HB469&ddlsponsors=&lsr=661
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=186&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=HB0469&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=HB469&ddlsponsors=&lsr=661

Bill Comments

feedback