NH HB468 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of political advocacy organization.
Title
Relative to the definition of political advocacy organization.
Sponsors
Rep. Connie Lane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-03-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 70 |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 02/17/2021 01:30 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/95842759377 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/93640014012 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initiallyconvened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 49 |