NH HB466 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2876s
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the capacity of electricity customer generators for eligibility for net energy metering.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the capacity of electricity customer generators for eligibility for net energy metering.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - OTP (Y: 231 N: 121 NV: 18 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2876s
2019-05-30SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/30/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24A
2019-04-24SenateHearing: 04/30/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-20HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 231-121 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 30
2019-03-12HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 33
2019-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-01-30House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/07/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-01-16House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 02:45 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback