NH HB465 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to workers' compensation for domestic employees.
Title
Relative to workers' compensation for domestic employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Charles McMahon [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] |
Rep. Barbara French [D] | Rep. Carl Seidel [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Susan Emerson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 8 |
2015-10-14 | House | Executive Session: 10/29/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-10-14 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/22/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-09-10 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/24/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-09-10 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 9/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-08-26 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-02-17 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/11/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG. 225 |