NH HB464 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/04/2021; Chapter 64; Eff: 06/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/04/2021; Chapter 64; Eff: 06/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the commission to study school funding.
Title
Relative to the commission to study school funding.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
Rep. Jason Osborne [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Claire Rouillard [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/04/2021; Chapter 64; Eff: 06/04/2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 104 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/20/2021); Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/06/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/27/2021, 10:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0841h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 46 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment # 2021-0841h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 46 |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0841h (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 41 |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing: 03/09/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97054508060 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 49 |