NH HB460 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/28/2017; Chapter 165; eff 01/01/18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to minutes under the right-to-know law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to minutes under the right-to-know law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/28/2017; Chapter 165; eff 01/01/18
2017-06-13HouseEnrolled 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 9
2017-06-13SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-01HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1620s (Rep. Hagan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 3
2017-05-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1620s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-11SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1620s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-03SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1620s, 05/11/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22
2017-04-06SenateHearing: 04/13/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 18
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0155h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 37
2017-03-08HouseAmendment #2017-0155h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 37
2017-02-22HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0155h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 11-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 17
2017-02-01HouseExecutive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback