NH HB459 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Special Order to to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Defining hemp, relative to its growth and use in New Hampshire, establishing a committee to study the federal guidelines on growing hemp, and relative to costs of care for animals seized in animal cruelty cases and prohibiting the future ownership of animals in certain animal cruelty cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defining hemp, relative to its growth and use in New Hampshire, establishing a committee to study the federal guidelines on growing hemp, and relative to costs of care for animals seized in animal cruelty cases and prohibiting the future ownership of animals in certain animal cruelty cases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateSpecial Order to to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2019-1976s and 2019-2258s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-2258s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1976s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1976s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-04-17SenateHearing: 04/23/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0790h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 19
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0790h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 19
2019-03-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0790h (NT) for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 8
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-02-20HousePublic Hearing: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback