NH HB457 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB457
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/18/2022; Chapter 29; Eff.06/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/18/2022; Chapter 29; Eff.06/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the meetings of the legislative youth advisory council.
Title
Relative to the meetings of the legislative youth advisory council.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Rep. Norman Silber [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] | Rep. Claire Rouillard [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 04/18/2022; Chapter 29; Eff.06/17/2022 |
2022-04-08 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 03/31/2022 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 03/31/2022); Senate Journal 8 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/17/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Hearing: 03/09/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-2211h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Amendment # 2021-2211h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2211h New Title 11/15/2021 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 11 |
2021-11-08 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-10-25 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-08-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/24/2021 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 03/08/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/97343187968 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initiallyconvened. |
2021-01-28 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 02/08/2021 02:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/99308877767 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 49 |
Same As/Similar To
HB457 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Executive Session: 11/08/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308