NH HB456 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2021; Chapter 54; Eff: 07/24/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2021; Chapter 54; Eff: 07/24/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the disclosure of information from vital records.
Title
Relative to the disclosure of information from vital records.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. Karen Umberger [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Peter Leishman [D] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2021; Chapter 54; Eff: 07/24/2021 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/13/2021); Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-17 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 104 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/22/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/14/2021, 10:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0306h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 25 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0306h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 25 |
2021-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0306h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 13 |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/99308877767 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 49 |