NH HB455 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB455
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the ability of a parent to enroll a child in the public school of their choice.
Title
Relative to the ability of a parent to enroll a child in the public school of their choice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session: 03/11/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95090800832 |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing: 03/04/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97017007180 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 49 |
Same As/Similar To
HB455 (Carry Over) 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207