NH HB454 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the requirement that certain governing bodies submit recommendations to the budget committee.
Title
Relative to the requirement that certain governing bodies submit recommendations to the budget committee.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Piemonte [R] | Rep. Michael Sylvia [R] | Rep. Chris True [R] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] |
Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Peter Torosian [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 44 |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 21 |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing: 03/03/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98208993032 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 48 |