NH HB453 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting the folding of election ballots and providing adequate envelops for absentee ballots to prevent folding.
Title
Relative to prohibiting the folding of election ballots and providing adequate envelops for absentee ballots to prevent folding.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristine Perez [R] | Rep. Katelyn Kuttab [R] | Rep. Erica Layon [R] | Rep. Katherine Prudhomme-O'Brien [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 5 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB453-FN-A 02/14/2023 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 4 |
2023-02-14 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/14/2023 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 16 |