NH HB453 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 03/22/2019; Chapter 1; Eff: 03/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Making changes to the membership of the state house bicentennial commission, declaring June 2 - June 8 as New Hampshire State House Bicentennial Week, and declaring June 6 as New Hampshire Legislators' Homecoming Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making changes to the membership of the state house bicentennial commission, declaring June 2 - June 8 as New Hampshire State House Bicentennial Week, and declaring June 6 as New Hampshire Legislators' Homecoming Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 03/22/2019; Chapter 1; Eff: 03/22/2019
2019-03-15HouseEnrolled 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 52
2019-03-15SenateEnrolled (In recess 03/14/2019); Senate Journal 9
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-20SenateHearing: 03/06/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 12
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced 02/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0080 (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 18
2019-02-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0080h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 18
2019-02-05HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0080h (NT) for 02/14/2019 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 9
2019-01-16HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback