NH HB452 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission on the first-in-the-nation presidential primary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission on the first-in-the-nation presidential primary.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenatePending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-08SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-18SenateHearing: 04/24/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-03-18SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0468h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 9
2019-02-27HouseAmendment # 2019-0468h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 9
2019-02-19HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0468h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 7
2019-02-19HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-23House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/12/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-10House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback