NH HB452 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.777
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.777
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Food and Drug Administration approval of medication, equipment, and therapies.
Title
Relative to Food and Drug Administration approval of medication, equipment, and therapies.
Sponsors
Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.777 |
2013-03-06 | House | Special Order to Mar 13 Without Objection; House Journal 24, PG.703 |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 6 (Vote 11-6; Part I, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.517 |
2013-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 2/14/2013 Legislative Office Building 205 11:00 Amendment Or One Hour After Governor's Budget Address |
2013-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.196 |