NH HB451 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 193; Effective 9/4/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 193; Effective 9/4/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to local approval of mining permits.
Title
Relative to local approval of mining permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-07 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 193; Effective 9/4/2015 |
2015-06-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 54, PG. 2102 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1735s (Rep J. Belanger): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1813 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1735s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1735s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1735s, 5/21/15; Senate Calendar 22 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Hearing: 5/6/15, Room 100, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 20 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0435h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 565-566 |
2015-03-04 | House | Amendment #0435h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 565-566 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0435h for Mar 4 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 350 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 224 |