NH HB450 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-02 - House Signed by the Governor 02/01/2010; Effective 04/02/2010; Chapter 0002
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-02 - House Signed by the Governor 02/01/2010; Effective 04/02/2010; Chapter 0002
Summary
Relative to the state 10-year transportation improvement program.
Title
Relative to the state 10-year transportation improvement program.
Sponsors
Rep. Candace Bouchard [D] | Rep. David Campbell [D] | Rep. John Graham [R] | Rep. Alfred Lerandeau [D] |
Sen. Robert Letourneau [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | House Signed by the Governor 02/01/2010; Effective 04/02/2010; Chapter 0002 | |
2010-01-25 | House Enrolled; House Journal 10, PG.458 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 3, Pg.47 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Passed By Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 2, Pg.27 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 2, Pg.26 | |
2010-01-07 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/13/10; Senate Calendar 2 | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17, Pg.388 | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17, Pg.388 | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Committee Report; Ought to Pass [05/27/09]; Senate Calendar 25 | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Hearing; March 26 , 2009, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 11:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Transportation & Interstate Cooperation; Senate Journal 8, pg. 134 | |
2009-03-04 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0159h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.591 | |
2009-03-04 | House Amendment #0159h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.591 | |
2009-02-20 | House Proposed Amendment #0159h; House Calendar 15, PG.324-325 | |
2009-02-20 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0159h for Mar 4 Consent Calendar (vote 17-0); House Calendar 16, PG.370 | |
2009-02-04 | House Executive Session: 2/11/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2009-02-03 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/10/2009 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2009-01-27 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/3/2009 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2009-01-20 | House Public Hearing: 1/27/2009 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2009-01-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 12, PG.228 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=187&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |