NH HB446 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Resources, Recreation and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study the effects of recreational vehicles and other vehicles used in recreational activities on class 5 and 6 roads.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study the effects of recreational vehicles and other vehicles used in recreational activities on class 5 and 6 roads.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseRetained in Committee
2021-03-03HousePublic Hearing: 03/03/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94760331850 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-27House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/17/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93611943701 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 48

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback