NH HB446 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 02:00 pm Reps Hall
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to initiating amendments and corrections to birth records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to initiating amendments and corrections to birth records.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2019 02:00 pm Reps Hall
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback