NH HB446 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1854s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to initiating amendments and corrections to birth records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to initiating amendments and corrections to birth records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - OTPA (Y: 224 N: 125 NV: 12 Abs: 39) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1854s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1854s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1854s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-03-28SenateHearing: 04/02/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0801h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 224-125 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 11
2019-03-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0801h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 11
2019-03-06HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0801h for 03/14/2019 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 7
2019-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-27HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 03/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2019 02:00 pm Reps Hall
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback