NH HB443 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; === BILL KILLED ===;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; === BILL KILLED ===;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting prison privatization.
Title
Prohibiting prison privatization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - OTP/AM 0563H (Y: 197 N: 136 NV: 26 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - LAY ON TABLE (REP RIDEOUT) (Y: 144 N: 189 NV: 26 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - OTP/AM 0563H (Y: 197 N: 136 NV: 26 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - LAY ON TABLE (REP RIDEOUT) (Y: 144 N: 189 NV: 26 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; === BILL KILLED ===; |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/2/13; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing: 4/9/13, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance |
2013-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0563h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 197-136; House Journal 29, PG.980-985 |
2013-03-21 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Rideout): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 144-189; House Journal 29, PG.981-983 |
2013-03-21 | House | Amendment #0563h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 29, PG.980-981 |
2013-03-06 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 23 PG.587-588 |
2013-03-06 | House | Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2013-0563h; House Calendar 23 PG.616 |
2013-03-06 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0563h for Mar 20 (Vote 13-5; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.587-588 |
2013-02-27 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 2/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 ==RECESSED== |
2013-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.195 |