NH HB441 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 235; Section 3 Effective 1/1/2016, Remaining Effective 9/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 235; Section 3 Effective 1/1/2016, Remaining Effective 9/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting the department of health and human services to share information in a termination of parental rights case with a foster parent who intends to adopt the child; and relative to financial affidavits submitted in hearings regarding child support, property settlement, and alimony.
Title
Permitting the department of health and human services to share information in a termination of parental rights case with a foster parent who intends to adopt the child; and relative to financial affidavits submitted in hearings regarding child support, property settlement, and alimony.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Lawrence Kappler [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Oligny [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Debra DeSimone [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 235; Section 3 Effective 1/1/2016, Remaining Effective 9/11/2015 |
2015-06-29 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2139 |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1951s (Rep Gargasz): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG. 1988 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1951s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1951s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Without Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow non-germane Amendment 1951s, New Title, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Chair Ruled Floor Amendment non-germane |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1951s, New Title, 6/4/15; Senate Calendar 24 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Hearing: 5/26/15, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m., on proposed amendment #2015-1613s - allowing the department of health and human services to share information in termination of parental rights cases with certain foster parents to HB 441 - relative to financial affidavits submitted in hearings regarding child support, property settlement, and alimony.; Senate Calendar 23 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Hearing: 5/5/15, Room 100, State House, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0614h: Motion Adopted DV 213-150; House Journal 24, PG. 832 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0614h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 832 |
2015-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0614h for Mar 11 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 412 |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 12, PG. 223 |