NH HB44 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 209-141 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 209-141 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to permissible residential units in a residential zone.
Title
Relative to permissible residential units in a residential zone.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - OTPA (Y: 117 N: 232 NV: 19 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - House - OTPA (Y: 117 N: 232 NV: 24 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - House - OTPA (Y: 117 N: 232 NV: 24 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 209-141 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 15 |
2023-02-23 | House | Lay HB44 on Table (Rep. Adjutant): Motion Failed DV 169-181 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 15 |
2023-02-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0029h: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 117-232 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 13 |
2023-02-23 | House | Amendment # 2023-0029h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 13 |
2023-02-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2023-02-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0029h 02/09/2023 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 23 |
2023-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government |