NH HB433 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB433

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-21 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Municipal and County Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that property tax exemptions granted prior to a home sale shall not be applied to the new homeowner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing that property tax exemptions granted prior to a home sale shall not be applied to the new homeowner.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-21HouseRetained in Committee
2023-02-13House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/16/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
2023-02-08HouseExecutive Session: 02/15/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301
2023-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303
2023-01-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 15

Same As/Similar To

HB433 (Carry Over) 2023-02-21 - Retained in Committee

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback