NH HB427 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB427
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 01/26/2022; Chapter 2; Eff. 03/27/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 01/26/2022; Chapter 2; Eff. 03/27/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting corporal punishment of children in state agency programs.
Title
Prohibiting corporal punishment of children in state agency programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] | Rep. Amanda Toll [D] | Rep. Jaci Grote [D] | Rep. Kendall Snow [D] |
Rep. Paul Berch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 01/26/2022; Chapter 2; Eff. 03/27/22 |
2022-01-25 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 01/06/2022 House Journal 2 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 01/05/2022); Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/05/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/13/2021; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/23/2021, 02:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0194h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 4 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0194h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 4 |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1494h (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 3 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2021 10:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92889961863 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 47 |
Same As/Similar To
HB427 (Carry Over) 2021-05-13 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15