NH HB427 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB427
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting corporal punishment of children in state agency programs.
Title
Prohibiting corporal punishment of children in state agency programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] | Rep. Amanda Toll [D] | Rep. Jaci Grote [D] | Rep. Kendall Snow [D] |
Rep. Paul Berch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/13/2021; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/23/2021, 02:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0194h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 4 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0194h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 4 |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1494h (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 3 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2021 10:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92889961863 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 47 |
Same As/Similar To
HB427 (Carry Over) 2021-05-13 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15