NH HB426 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-01 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/28/2023; Chapter 152; eff: 09/26/2023 House Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the regulation of pharmacists-in-charge and pharmacies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the regulation of pharmacists-in-charge and pharmacies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-01HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/28/2023; Chapter 152; eff: 09/26/2023 House Journal 17
2023-06-28SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/15/2023); Senate Journal 20
2023-06-28HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 House Journal 16 P. 16
2023-06-21HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2186e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/15/2023
2023-06-21SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2186e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/15/2023); Senate Journal 20
2023-05-11SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14
2023-04-26SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21
2023-03-28SenateHearing: 04/12/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 16
2023-03-24SenateIntroduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 12
2023-03-22HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 5
2023-03-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass 03/08/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 4
2023-02-23HouseExecutive Session: 03/08/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2023-02-23HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
2023-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2023 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2023-01-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback