NH HB423 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-24 - Lay HB423 on Table (Rep. Yokela): Motion Adopted DV 203-178 03/23/2023 House Journal 11 P. 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-24 - Lay HB423 on Table (Rep. Yokela): Motion Adopted DV 203-178 03/23/2023 House Journal 11 P. 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to accessory dwelling unit uses allowed by right.
Title
Relative to accessory dwelling unit uses allowed by right.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Lay HB423 on Table (Rep. Yokela): Motion Adopted DV 203-178 03/23/2023 House Journal 11 P. 39 |
2023-03-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2023-03-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB423 02/15/2023 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 40 |
2023-02-13 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/16/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 02/15/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2023 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 15 |