NH HB423 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to budget committee membership.
Title
Relative to budget committee membership.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Torosian [R] | Rep. Chris True [R] | Rep. John Janigian [R] | Rep. Scott Wallace [R] |
Rep. Becky Owens [R] | Rep. Michael Yakubovich [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 17 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 30 |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 13 |