NH HB422 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. L. Turcotte): Motion Adopted DV 206-158 02/02/2023 House Journal 4 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. L. Turcotte): Motion Adopted DV 206-158 02/02/2023 House Journal 4 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To create a public county registry of the monthly rent charged by landlords for each owned unit.
Title
To create a public county registry of the monthly rent charged by landlords for each owned unit.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Kathy Staub [D] | Rep. Jodi Newell [D] | Rep. Christine Seibert [D] |
Rep. Cam Kenney [D] | Rep. Eric Gallager [D] | Rep. Daniel Veilleux [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. L. Turcotte): Motion Adopted DV 206-158 02/02/2023 House Journal 4 P. 12 |
2023-02-02 | House | Lay HB422 on Table (Rep. Read): Motion Failed DV 163-200 02/02/2023 House Journal 4 P. 12 |
2023-02-01 | House | Removed from Consent (Reps. Read, Wheeler, Santonastaso, Yokela, T. Mannion, Newell, Horrigan, Gallager, Popovici-Muller, H. Howard) 02/01/2023 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB422-FN 01/25/2023 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 5 |
2023-01-18 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 15 |